Chittock, Dean Robert (CPSO#: 59697)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Sep 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Sep 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 22 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Sep 1996