Chiu, Anthony Siu Keung (CPSO#: 42680)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 11 Sep 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 1990