Chiu, Bobby Ting Liang (CPSO#: 65105)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hakka, Hindi, Mandarin, Urdu

Education:University of Madras, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ellesmere Medical Health Care Centr
Suite # 302, 520 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone: (416) 609-1859
Fax: (416) 609-9002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bob T.L. Chiu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chiu ( CPSO# 65105 )

Business Address:
52 Sheila Crescent
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3A1

Business Address:
520 Ellesmere Road
Suite 302
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone Number: (416) 609-1859

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BOBBY TING LIANG CHIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993