Chiu, Hak Fai (CPSO#: 25910)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 14 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1973
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Apr 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1974
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Apr 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1984
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008