Chiu, Isabelle (CPSO#: 55693)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Sep 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 05 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Sep 1991