Chiu, James Shing Ping (CPSO#: 29063)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Mar 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008