Chiu, Kin-Yan Brian (CPSO#: 30486)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jan 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Mar 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5B4.14 WC Mackenzie Centre
UA Hospital
8400 - 112 Street
Edmonton AB  T6G 2B7
Phone: (780) 407-6959
Fax: (780) 407-3009

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 03 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIN-YAN BRIAN CHIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Nov 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 1987