Chiu, Ming-Chai (CPSO#: 22493)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:National Taiwan University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2015