Chiu, Patrick Lang Ming (CPSO#: 82800)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pacific Medical Clinic
Unit F33
4300 Steeles Avenue East
Markham ON  L3R 0Y5
Phone: (905) 604-7889
Fax: (905) 604-7890
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick L. Chiu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chiu ( CPSO# 82800 )

Business Address:
Unit F33
4300 Steeles Avenue East
Markham ON  L3R 0Y5
Phone Number: (905) 604-7889

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK LANG MING CHIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007