Chiu, Sidney Shan-Li (CPSO#: 97959)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIDNEY SHAN-LI CHIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017