Chiu, Simon Kwok Hang (CPSO#: 84432)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Simon K. H. Chiu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 24 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: MCI The Doctors Office, 325 Bamburgh Circle, Scarborough, ON, M1W 3L6
Date Received: 20 Mar 2017

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Mar 2017