Chiu, Wendy Shiu-Wen (CPSO#: 74180)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 17 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Aug 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 May 2005