Chizea, Chibuike Henry (CPSO#: 111020)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Oct 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 09 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Lagos, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
935 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 2C6
Phone: 7056754883
Electoral District: 08

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nigeria

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHIBUIKE HENRY CHIZEA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CHIZEA is enrolled at NORTHERN ONTARIO SCHOOL OF MEDICINE;

(2) Dr. CHIZEA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHIZEA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. CHIZEA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CHIZEA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CHIZEA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 17 Oct 2016 to 08 Jan 2017
Assessment Verification Period - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 09 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 22 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 23 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018