Chizen, Lawrence Steven (CPSO#: 63733)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 136A
1 Yorkgate Boulevard
Toronto ON  M3N 3A1
Phone: (416) 451-8538
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAWRENCE STEVEN CHIZEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIZEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1994
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2010
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2015