Chlebus, Andrew (CPSO#: 16955)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Nov 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Nov 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Chlebus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 15 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 12 Nov 1962 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Nov 2017

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: November 28, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: Member
Active Date: October 25, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Andrew Chlebus to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 25, 2017:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Chlebus engaged in professional misconduct in the administration of his practice and in his billings to OHIP, and whether he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Chlebus resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)