Chmiel, Agnes Eve (CPSO#: 77768)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Regional Rehabilitation Centre
300 Wellington Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 0A4
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 40817
Fax: (905) 577-8233
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chmiel Szpakowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Szpakowski ( CPSO# 84866 )
Dr. A. Chmiel ( CPSO# 77768 )

Business Address:
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Business Address:
Regional Rehabilitation
300 Wellington Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 0A4
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AGNES EVE CHMIEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHMIEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007