Chmielowiec, Chester Joel (CPSO#: 45155)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1980 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 2004