Cho, Byoung Chun John (CPSO#: 80621)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Suite 7-218
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 946-2124
Fax: 416 946 6566
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Byoung Chun John Cho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Cho ( CPSO# 80621 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Suite 7-218
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 946-2124

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BYOUNG CHUN JOHN CHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2004