Cho, Charles Young (CPSO#: 79346)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 6595
Fax: (905) 952-2818
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
Phone: (416) 946-2125
Fax: (416) 946-4586
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Charles Cho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Yu ( CPSO# 78007 )
Dr. C. Cho ( CPSO# 79346 )

Business Address:
Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
Southlake Hospital
Department of Radiation Oncology
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4545

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES YOUNG CHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2009