Choi, Edwin (CPSO#: 66937)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
325 Bamburgh Circle
Scarborough ON  M1W 3Y1
Phone: (416) 492-8068
Fax: (416) 497-7796
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 09 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWIN CHOI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1999