Choi, Ellen Hon-May (CPSO#: 67848)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dawson Road Family Medical Clinic
83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone: (519) 766-1360 Ext. 322
Fax: (519) 763-4315
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Schieck Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Schieck ( CPSO# 67742 )
Dr. E. Choi ( CPSO# 67848 )

Business Address:
83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 766-1360

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELLEN HON-MAY CHOI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1996