Choi, Man Fung Vincent (CPSO#: 66233)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 21 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994