Choi, Perry Praharita (CPSO#: 82904)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7373
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Perry Choi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Choi ( CPSO# 82904 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1S4
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
Suite 201
6212 Main Street
Stouffville ON  L4A 2S5

Business Address:
Suite 202
110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PERRY PRAHARITA CHOI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 2011