Choi, Tat-Hung Jacob (CPSO#: 33479)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tat Hung Choi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 3 Marlborough Street Richmond Hill, ON L4B 2W7
Date Received: 05 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Apr 2017