Chomej, Anna Katarzyna (CPSO#: 74923)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
1051 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 3A6
Phone: (905) 667-2600
Fax: (905) 667-2601
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 21 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA KATARZYNA CHOMEJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOMEJ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 26 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2012