Chomienne, Marie-Helene (CPSO#: 74363)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Oct 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Oct 1999

Summary

Former Names: Chomienne-Abboud, Marie-Helene (used until: 17 May 2007 )     Abboud, Marie-Helene (used until: 24 Oct 2001 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Pierre Et Marie Curie University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 6093
Fax: (613) 748-4953
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M-H Chomienne Médecine Société Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chomienne ( CPSO# 74363 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE-HELENE CHOMIENNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOMIENNE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1999