Chong, Adrian Ann-Shueng (CPSO#: 94827)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Queensland, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 21 Feb 2011 to 02 May 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 03 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 21 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Dec 2012