Chong, Chin Ted (CPSO#: 90276)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Singapore, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2009 to 01 Apr 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 02 Apr 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2010