Chong, Donald Ton (CPSO#: 22126)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1969
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Jul 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Feb 2015