Chong, Esther (CPSO#: 69162)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Richpoint Medical Centre
10815 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3E3
Phone: (905) 770-3004
Fax: (905) 770-5663
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

30 Isabella St.
Toronto ON  M4Y 1N1
Canada
Phone: (416) 924-4640 Ext. 2044
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Esther Chong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Chong ( CPSO# 69162 )

Business Address:
30 Isabella Street
Toronto ON  M4Y 1N1
Phone Number: (416) 924-4640

Business Address:
Richpoint Medical Centre
10815 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3E3
Phone Number: (905) 770-3004

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ESTHER CHONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1997