Chong, Joseph Ming (CPSO#: 65448)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peace Arch Hospital
Emergency Department
15521 Russell Avenue
White Rock BC  V4B 2R4
Phone: (604) 531-5572
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

101 - 777 West Broadway
Vancouver BC  V5Z 4J7
Canada
Phone: (604) 734-8252
Fax: (604) 734-8254
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH MING CHONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993