Chong, Karen Lynn Elizabeth (CPSO#: 67754)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Feb 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Feb 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Ontario Power Generation Building
700 University Avenue
Room 3-710
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586-4523
Fax: (416) 586-4723
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen Chong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chong ( CPSO# 67754 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Ontario Power Generation Building
700 University Avenue
Room 3-710
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4523

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 02 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN LYNN ELIZABETH CHONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 1999