Chong, Paul Woon Chung (CPSO#: 68082)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
9350 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 5G2
Phone: (905) 883-8220
Fax: (905) 883-8227
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4421
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Mackenzie Health
Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul W. Chong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chong ( CPSO# 68082 )

Business Address:
203 - 9350 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 5G2
Phone Number: (905) 883-8220

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 11 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL WOON CHUNG CHONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998