Chong Ping, Aldric Michael (CPSO#: 25253)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 May 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 May 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1972
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 May 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1975
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 27 Nov 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 May 2004