Chong, Sylvia Lun (CPSO#: 70495)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Headwaters Health Care Centre
(Dufferin-Caledon Health Care Corp.
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone: (519) 941-2410 Ext. 2214
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sylvia Chong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chong ( CPSO# 70495 )

Business Address:
Headwaters Health Care Centre
Dufferin-Caledon Health Care Corp.
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (579) 941-2410

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYLVIA LUN CHONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1998