Chong, Walter James (CPSO#: 26146)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 May 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 May 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of West Indies, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 May 2002