Choo, Ivan Shuh Yen (CPSO#: 66440)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 2002