Choo, Shu May (CPSO#: 69691)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Nov 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Nov 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Singapore, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 12 Nov 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Nov 1996