Choong, Albert Poh Soon (CPSO#: 25262)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Oct 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Sep 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 30 Sep 2017

Pending Discipline Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Choong’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Choong failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct and/or sexual abuse of Patient in his examinations of Patient A including by touching the breasts, thighs and vaginal area of Patient A.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): 3rd Party Records Motion: February 5, 2018 Hearing dates: March 2-19-20, April 2-3.

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from 12:01 a.m., September 30, 2017, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints
            and Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the
            following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of
            registration held by Dr. Albert Poh Soon Choong:

            Practice Monitor and Patient Log

            (i)   Dr. Choong shall not engage in any professional encounters, in person or
                  otherwise (the "Professional Encounter") with patients of any age in any
                  jurisdiction, unless the Professional Encounter takes place in the
                  continuous presence of and under the continuous observation of a monitor
                  who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College (the
                  "Practice Monitor"), and unless the other requirements provided in the
                  Order are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Choong may not be alone
                  with any patient, for any length of time, during any Professional
                  Encounter, whether or not the parent or guardian of the patient is also
                  present. 

            (ii)  At all times, Dr. Choong shall ensure that the Practice Monitor shall:

                  (a)   Provide reports (as described in the Practice Monitor's
                        undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly basis; 
                  
                  (b)   Remain present at all times during all Professional Encounters with
                        all patients;
                  
                  (c)   Carefully observe all of Dr. Choong's Professional Encounters with
                        patients including, but not limited to, physical and internal
                        examinations.  It is Dr. Choong's obligation to ensure that the
                        Practice Monitor's view of all of his Professional Encounters with
                        patients, including physical and internal examinations, is
                        unobstructed at all times;  
                  
                  (d)   Refrain from performing other functions, except those required in
                        the Practice Monitor's undertaking attached as Appendix "B" to the
                        Order, while observing Dr. Choong in all his Professional
                        Encounters with patients;
                  
                  (e)   Maintain a log of all Professional Encounters with patients in the
                        form attached to the Order as Appendix "C" (the "Log");
                  
                  (f)   Initial all corresponding entries in the records of patients noted
                        in the Log; and
                  
                  (g)   Submit the original Log to the College on a monthly basis.
                  
            (iii) Dr. Choong shall maintain a copy of the Log at all times, and shall make
                  it available to the College upon request.



            Notification of Practice Locations

            (iv)  Dr. Choong shall inform the College of each and every location that he
                  practices or has privileges including, but not limited to, hospital(s),
                  clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively the "Practice
                  Location(s)"), within five (5) days of the Order.  Going forward, he
                  shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within
                  five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

            Posting a Sign and Translations

            (v)   Dr. Choong shall post a sign all waiting rooms, examination rooms and
                  consulting rooms, in all of his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible
                  and secure location, in the form attached to the Order as Appendix "D"
                  that states: "Dr. Albert Poh Soon Choong must not have professional
                  encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients, of any age, unless in
                  the continuous presence of and under the continuous observation of a
                  practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of
                  Ontario. Dr. Choong must not be alone during any professional encounter
                  with any patient. Further information may be found on the College website
                  at www.cpso.on.ca." 

            (vi)  Dr. Choong shall post a certified translation(s) in any language(s) in
                  which he provides services, of the sign described in (v) above, in all
                  waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all of his
                  Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form
                  attached to the Order as Appendix "D."

            (vii) Dr. Choong shall provide the certified translation(s) described in (vi)
                  above to the College within 30 days of the date of the Order.

            Notifying Patients

            (viii)Dr. Choong shall ensure that each patient with whom he has a Professional
                  Encounter is directly notified, prior to the Professional Encounter, of
                  the details of the restriction described in (i), above. 

            (ix)  With respect to patients that are scheduled at least seven (7) days in
                  advance, Dr. Choong shall ensure that each patient is directly notified,
                  within seven (7) days after the appointment is scheduled, of the details
                  of the restriction described in (i) above.

            Monitoring

            (x)   Dr. Choong shall consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of
                  the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or any person or institution who
                  may have relevant information in order for the College to monitor Dr.
                  Choong's compliance with the terms of the Order and shall promptly sign
                  such consents as may be necessary for the College to obtain information
                  from these persons or institutions.

            (xi)  Dr. Choong shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced
                  inspections of his Practice Locations and to inspections of patient
                  charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems
                  necessary in order to monitor Dr. Choong's compliance with the terms of
                  the Order.

            (xii) Dr. Choong shall consent to the College providing any and all information
                  to the Practice Monitor that the College deems necessary or desirable in
                  order to assist the Practice Monitor in fulfilling their Undertaking and
                  in order to monitor Dr. Choong's compliance with the terms of the Order.

            (xiii)Dr. Choong shall consent to all Practice Monitors to disclose to the
                  College, and to one another, any information relevant to the Order,
                  relevant to the terms of the Practice Monitor's Undertaking and/or
                  relevant for the purposes of monitoring Dr. Choong's compliance with the
                  Order.

            (xiv) Dr. Choong shall consent to the College providing the Order to any
                  Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any
                  Practice Location where he practices or has privileges ("Chief(s) of
                  Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the
                  College has that led to the Order and/or any information arising from the
                  monitoring of his compliance with the Order.

            (xv)  Dr. Choong shall be solely responsible for the payment of all fees,
                  costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of the
                  Order.