Choong, Karen Li Mei (CPSO#: 66927)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Malay

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
Room HSC 3E-20,
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76651
Fax: (905) 570-8973
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mayer Choong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Choong ( CPSO# 66927 )
Dr. P. Mayer ( CPSO# 63219 )

Business Address:
McMaster Childrens Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
Room HSC 3E-20
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
The Mayer Institute
20 Railway Street
Hamilton ON  L8R 2R3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN LI MEI CHOONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1993