Chopek, Ashley Jean (CPSO#: 108331)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Sep 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 25 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: Globa, Ashley Jean (used until: 05 Sep 2017 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Hematology/Oncology
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHLEY JEAN CHOPEK shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CHOPEK is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. CHOPEK shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHOPEK is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. CHOPEK shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CHOPEK is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CHOPEK no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jan 2016 to 09 Feb 2016
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 25 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Feb 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2017