Chopra, Angeli (CPSO#: 92081)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 09 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dayanand Medical College, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2009 to 20 Sep 2009
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 02 May 2013 to 09 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jun 2013