Chopra, Anurag (CPSO#: 58440)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519) 272-8210
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anurag Chopra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chopra ( CPSO# 58440 )

Business Address:
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANURAG CHOPRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOPRA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1988