Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Chopra, Ashna (CPSO#: 64198)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4421
Fax: (519) 255-2130
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ashna Chopra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chopra ( CPSO# 64198 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4421

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHNA CHOPRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOPRA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1992