Chopra, Kevin Kumar (CPSO#: 74847)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Shores
700 Gordon Street
Whitby, Ontario
Whitby ON  L1N5S9
Phone: 9056685881 Ext. 6857
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chatterjee Chopra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chatterjee ( CPSO# 74853 )
Dr. K. Chopra ( CPSO# 74847 )

Business Address:
Unit 3-4
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone Number: (905) 668-5881

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN KUMAR CHOPRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOPRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005