Chopra, Priya (CPSO#: 68760)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 May 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 May 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 611
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone: (905) 866-6462
Fax: (647) 361-8608
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Priya Chopra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chopra ( CPSO# 68760 )

Business Address:
Suite 611
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone Number: (905) 866-6462

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRIYA CHOPRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOPRA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 17 Nov 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 18 Nov 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 2001