Chopra, Supriya (CPSO#: 87681)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Mumbai, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2007 to 26 Oct 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 27 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2009