Choptiany, Philip Jerome (CPSO#: 28319)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 May 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 330
Willowdale ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 497-6444
Fax: (416) 497-4793
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 May 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 09 Aug 2011
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 10 Aug 2011
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 10 Oct 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 09 Aug 2011 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., August 9, 2011, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
            and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr.
            Philip Jerome Choptiany:

                  i)    Dr. Choptiany shall conduct all breast, pelvic and/or rectal
                        examinations of any female patients in the presence of another
                        female regulated health professional as set out in the undertaking
                        attached to this Order as Appendix "A".
                  
                  ii)   Dr. Choptiany shall post a sign in his waiting room and in each of
                        his examination rooms, in clearly visible locations that states:
                        "Under no circumstances will Dr. Choptiany perform a breast,
                        pelvic, or rectal examination except in the presence of a female
                        regulated health professional."
                  

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Aug 2011
Summary:

On August 9, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Philip Jerome Choptiany   
committed an act of professional misconduct, in that engaged in conduct or an act or omission 
relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
With respect to Patient A, in the summer of 2006 Dr. Choptiany inappropriately commented 
"nice Brazilian tan lines" to Patient A during a medically-indicated breast examination. 
Furthermore, prior to conducting a medically-indicated pelvic examination, Dr. Choptiany did 
not: 
1)    Explain why he viewed this examination as appropriate in the circumstances; 
2)    Explain the steps involved in the examination; or  
3)    Ascertain whether the patient was comfortable with the steps involved in the examination 
      that he was about to undertake. 
 
With respect to Patient B, in approximately 1994 Dr. Choptiany did not take sufficient care to 
maintain spatial boundaries while he performed a medically-indicated breast examination upon 
her. This resulted in Patient B feeling Dr. Choptiany's pelvic area against her arm while he 
conducted the breast examination. Dr. Choptiany also made inappropriate comments to Patient B 
regarding her sexual relationship with her husband. 
 
With respect to Patient C, Dr. Choptiany made inappropriate comments to this patient regarding 
her sexual relationship with her husband during a medical appointment in 1991. 
 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    Dr. Choptiany appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
 
2.    The Registrar suspend Dr. Choptiany's certificate of registration for a period of two (2) 
      months commencing at 12:01 a.m. on August 10, 2011. 
 
3.    The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Choptiany's 
      certificate of registration: 
 
      i)    Dr. Choptiany shall conduct all breast, pelvic and/or rectal examinations of any 
            female patients in the presence of another female regulated health professional as 
            set out in the undertaking attached to this Order as Appendix "A". 
      ii)   Dr. Choptiany shall post a sign in his waiting room and in each of his examination 
            rooms, in clearly visible locations that states: "Under no circumstances will Dr. 
            Choptiany perform a breast, pelvic, or rectal examination except in the presence 
            of a female regulated health professional." 
 
4.    Dr. Choptiany pay to the College costs in the amount of $3650.00 within 30 days of the 
      date of this Order.  
 
              

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): August 9, 2011