Chorneyko, Katherine Anne (CPSO#: 60884)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brant Community Healthcare System
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544 Ext. 2446
Fax: (519) 752-7809
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 04 Jul 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE ANNE CHORNEYKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHORNEYKO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Laboratory Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1991