Chou, Angela (CPSO#: 69905)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Corporation
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone: (905) 623-3331 Ext. 1311
Fax: (905) 697-5115
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Corporation
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 4579
Fax: (905) 721-7763
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Angela Chou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chou ( CPSO# 69905 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Corporation
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA CHOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 28 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998